Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Limited Lines - Travel Insurance
Sponsored by
Senator Garagiola
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified provisions relating to limited lines insurance for transportation tickets to relate instead to limited lines travel insurance; authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to issue a limited lines license to an individual or business entity to sell travel insurance; authorizing a travel retailer to offer and disseminate travel insurance under specified circumstances under the direction of a limited lines travel insurance producer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1135
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/05/2013 Text - First - Limited Lines - Travel Insurance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-122, 10-130 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM