Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Vacancy Reform Act
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Miller, Astle, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Providing that an individual who was appointed to fill a vacancy in an office during the recess of the Senate or who was nominated to fill a vacancy in an office during a regular session of the Senate is prohibited from being nominated for the same office at the same session, unless requested by the Senate, being appointed to the same office during the recess of the Senate, and continuing to serve in the office or being designated to serve in an acting capacity for the same office after a certain time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Executive Nominations  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0422
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Vacancy Reform Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 5:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753024/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Vacancy Reform Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-6)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (84-48)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Delegate Frick) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-47)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Vacancy Reform Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Executive Nominations
Text - First - State Vacancy Reform Act
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/05 at 5:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Executive Nominations
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Executive Nominations
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments {753024/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - State Vacancy Reform Act
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (39-6) 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Referred Appropriations 44
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable Adopted 52A
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Second Reading Passed 52A
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (84-48) 53
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Delegate Frick) Adopted 53
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (87-47) 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Text - Chapter - State Vacancy Reform Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-109, 8-3A-01 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM