Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an employer to provide employees with a specified work schedule within a specified time period, notify employees of specified changes, and provide employees with a new work schedule within 24 hours after making a change to the initial schedule; requiring an employer to conspicuously post at each work site specified work schedules; requiring an employer to pay specified predictability pay under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0969
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2015 3/26/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-106, 3-102, 3-103, 3-1301 through 3-1311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM