Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Develop a Strategic Plan for State Park Development
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Develop a Strategic Plan for State Park Development; providing the purpose of the Task Force is to develop strategic principles and a policy framework for mid- to long-term decisions on the allocation of the funding provided to the State parks; requiring, to the extent practicable, that the composition of the Task Force reflect the gender, racial, ethnic, and geographic diversity of the State; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations by December 31, 2017; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM