Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, on or before January 1, 2021, to develop and publish materials to assist State residents with long-term care family planning; requiring certain materials to meet certain requirements, be consistent with certain other materials, and include certain contact information; requiring the Department to make certain materials available in certain languages; and requiring certain State agencies to update certain websites in a certain manner on or before January 1, 2021.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable Adopted 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 49
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:54 AM