Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial and Equity Impact note – 2021 Maryland Police Reform Proposals
Synopsis
Requiring a custodian of records to deny inspection of the part of a recording from a certain body-worn digital recording device worn by a law enforcement officer regarding certain individuals; requiring certain notification of certain individuals; requiring the Police Training and Standards Commission to develop certain uniform standards and policies; requiring a custodian to deny inspection or copying of a certain recording by an individual who is under investigation or charged with a violation that is the subject of the recording; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0767 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {838774/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Senate 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {838774/1 Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Judiciary 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 8:04 PM
Click to return on the top page