Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Montgomery, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a system of public financing of campaigns for specified General Assembly candidates; requiring the State Board of Elections to administer the system; requiring the Comptroller to credit to the Fair Campaign Financing Fund money collected under specified provisions of the Act and to distribute public contributions to the campaign finance entities of specified candidates; specifying procedures, requirements, and conditions participating candidates must meet to receive a distribution from the Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0418
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014, July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-235, 15.5-101 through 15.5-118, 15-103, 15-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM