Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland After-School and Summer Opportunity Fund Program - Funding Requirement
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Ferguson, Montgomery, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the After-School and Summer Opportunity Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Governor's Office for Children to administer the Fund as directed by a specified committee; and requiring the Governor to provide at least $5,000,000 to the Fund in the annual State budget.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-1101, 8-1102, 8-1104, 8-1105, 8-1105 through 8-1107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM