Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Bates
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting health care practitioners and health care facilities from denying patients life-preserving health care services requested by a specified person on the basis of a specified view or disagreement; authorizing specified persons to file an action for an injunction in a specified court under specified circumstances; authorizing a health care practitioner, under specified circumstances, to provide specified reasons as a defense to an action filed under a specified provision of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0644
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM