Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Ambient Air Quality Control - Cumulative Air Impact Analysis
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Ramirez, Currie, Guzzone, Lee, Manno, Montgomery, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of the Environment from issuing a specified air quality permit until specified requirements have been met; prohibiting the Department from recommending specified licensing conditions until specified requirements have been met; requiring the Department to conduct a Cumulative Air Impact Analysis under specified circumstances in accordance with specified requirements; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0987
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1301 through 2-1306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM