Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Jennings, Klausmeier, and Mathias
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 826
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person who owns, operates, or controls a ticket website from using in the Uniform Resource Locator (URL) of the ticket website certain lower-level domain names that contain the name of the venue for which the tickets grant admission, the name of certain entertainment events, or certain other names; providing for the application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0740
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {217975/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-43)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 826
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {217975/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Economic Matters 50
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted 55
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (94-43) 56
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 826
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-4001, 14-4003 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM