Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of a specified credit against the State income tax from $1 to $5 for each bushel of oyster shells recycled during the taxable year; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0815
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {525969/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senators Manno, Eckardt, and Currie
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Delegates Walker, Reilly, and Platt
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Second Reading Passed 38
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 43
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {525969/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1) 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Requests House Recede 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senators Manno, Eckardt, and Currie 63
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Refuses to Recede 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Delegates Walker, Reilly, and Platt 70
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 68
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 72
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Passed Enrolled 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-724.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM