Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Minimum Wage Rate - Payment and Adoption
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of the State minimum wage rate to $8.25 per hour; authorizing employers to pay specified employees a specified training wage of $7.25 per hour; providing that employers may only pay specified employees a training wage for a specified period of time; prohibiting a county from adopting a minimum wage law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM