Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey, Eckardt, and Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to convene a workgroup to evaluate and make findings and recommendations regarding the state of mental health care delivery on the Eastern Shore of Maryland; requiring the workgroup to include specified individuals; requiring the Department to report the findings and recommendations of the workgroup to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1053
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1097 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM