Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Community Investment Tax Credit - Verification of Credit Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to use the information contained in a certain report to verify that a certain business entity or individual is eligible for a credit against the State income tax for contributions to certain projects; prohibiting the Comptroller from requiring a business entity or an individual to submit additional information with the business entity's or individual's income tax return to claim a certain income tax credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Community Investment Tax Credit - Verification of Credit Eligibility
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM