Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Valuation of Real Property - Internet Database
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the State Department of Assessments and Taxation maintain a public database on the Department's Web site that relates to the valuation of specified real property in the State and includes specified information about each property; requiring the Department to maintain a public database on the Department's Web site of assessment worksheets and cards relating to the valuation of real property in the State; and providing that specified assessment worksheets and cards may not include income and expense statements.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0553 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM