Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses
Sponsored by
Senators Shank, Raskin, Hershey, Jacobs, Muse, Ramirez, Reilly, Simonaire, Stone, Young, and Forehand
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a law enforcement agency from using captured plate data unless the agency has a legitimate law enforcement purpose; establishing that information gathered by an automatic license plate reader system is not subject to disclosure under the Maryland Public Information Act; requiring the Department of State Police, in conjunction with the Maryland Coordination and Analysis Center and specified law enforcement agencies, to report annually specified information to the General Assembly beginning in 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0289
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {188779/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {232118/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {188779/2 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/04/2014 4/04/2014 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable with Amendments {232118/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-304, 4-326 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM