Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program Fund
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the requirement to provide an annual appropriation of $12,000,000 in the State budget for the Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program Fund through fiscal year 2026.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0867
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program Fund
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page