Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsored by
Senators Jones-Rodwell, Madaleno, Forehand, Rosapepe, Benson, Garagiola, Peters, and Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the tobacco tax rate on cigarettes and other tobacco products; providing that the Tobacco Use Prevention and Cessation Program shall receive funding from the Other Tobacco Products Tax Fund under specified circumstances; requiring money from the Fund to be used to supplement appropriations to the Tobacco Use Prevention and Cessation Program to reach a specified level of funding; providing for a supplementary appropriation to the Tobacco Use Prevention and Cessation Program in fiscal year 2014; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0683
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013, July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1002, 13-1015 )
(   12-105, 12-202, 12-401, 2-1601, 2-1602, 2-1602.1, 2-1603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM