Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Registration of Pesticides - Fee Increase - Disposition of Fees
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing specified pesticide registration fees from $100 to $110; and providing that $10 of each annual registration fee and each terminal registration fee collected under § 5-105 of the Agriculture Article may be used only for activities of the Department of Agriculture relating to the collection, analysis, and reporting of data on pesticide use in the State; specifying that money expended from the State Chemist fund for a specified purpose is supplemental to other specified funding; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0621
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-6)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-33)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed 38
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (37-6) 40
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 43
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (102-33) 61
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-105, 6-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM