Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings and Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a ticket seller or an operator of a ticket seller's Web site from prohibiting the transfer of a specified ticket, requiring an additional fee for the transfer of a specified ticket, or requiring a purchaser of a ticket to present specified identification or a specified credit card to gain entry to an entertainment event; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0670
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-4001, 14-4002.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM