Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to identify specified biosafety level 3 (BSL-3) laboratories and the location of the laboratories; requiring the Department to collect information from the laboratories relevant to public health and safety; requiring the laboratories to report the information the Department; requiring the Department to report annually the number and location of the laboratories to officials in each local jurisdiction; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0699
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM