Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - Renaming
Sponsored by
Senators Robinson, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Reilly, Salling, Smith, Young, Zucker, and Oaks
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Governor's Office of Minority Affairs to be the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs; renaming the Special Secretary for the Office of Minority Affairs to be the Special Secretary for the Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs; renaming the Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs to be the Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1506
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {723522/1 (Senator Oaks) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - Renaming
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Floor Amendment {723522/1 (Senator Oaks) Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - Renaming
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 46
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Text - Chapter - State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - Renaming
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1001 )
(   9-1605.2, 9-1605.3, 9-345, 9-421 )
(   20-303, 24-310 )
(   12-105, 12-110, 14-302, 14-303, 14-305, 14-308, 14-503, 14-505, 6-222 )
(   9-1A-10, 9-1A-23, 9-1A-36, 9-20C-02, 9-301 through 9-303.1, 9-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM