Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal Refuge
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Guzzone, King, Manno, and Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal Refuge; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study, analyze, identify, evaluate, and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2018; and terminating the Act after May 31, 2019.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0980
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal Refuge
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM