Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsored by
Senators Jones-Rodwell, Frosh, Currie, Forehand, McFadden, Muse, and Pugh
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to petition the court to shield court records and police records relating to a conviction of the person no earlier than 5 years after the person satisfies the sentence imposed for the conviction, including parole, probation, or mandatory supervision; providing that, if the person is convicted of a new crime during a specified time period, the original conviction is not eligible for shielding unless the new conviction becomes eligible for shielding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {688279/1
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Astle) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {688279/1
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (39-8)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Garagiola) {973628/1 Rejected (6-40)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) {873925/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-6)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {688279/1 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Astle) Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable with Amendments {688279/1 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Committee Amendment Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (39-8) 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Garagiola) {973628/1 Rejected (6-40) 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) {873925/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (41-6) 62
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 64
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Hearing 4/08 at 3:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301 through 10-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM