Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal System
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings, Klausmeier, and Salling
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Baltimore County to grant a credit against the county property tax for owner-occupied residential real property within a specified proximity to a specified refuse disposal system; prohibiting the governing body of Baltimore County from granting a credit for taxable years beginning after a specified date; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0257
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0981 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {569834/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {233127/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-1)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {285063/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Sydnor) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-4)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {569834/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {233127/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (43-1) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 53
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {285063/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Sydnor) Adopted 63
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-4) 64
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendment 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM