Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Currie, Edwards, Ferguson, Garagiola, King, Kittleman, Manno, Montgomery, Ramirez, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Designating specified periods each year to be tax-free periods during which an exemption from the sales and use tax is provided for the sale of specified textbooks purchased by full-time or part-time students enrolled at specified higher education institutions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0052
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0809 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-232 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM