Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Supermarkets - Class B and Class BLX Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting the issuance of a specified Class B or Class BLX on-sale beer, wine and liquor license for a specified corporation from specified residency requirements; exempting the issuance of a Class B or Class BLX on-sale beer, wine and liquor license on behalf of a specified supermarket or supermarket chain store from a specified prohibition against the issuance of more than one license for the use of a corporation in Baltimore City or any county of the State; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0311
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-101, 9-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM