Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
CINA Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Blindness of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that, in making a disposition on a child in need of assistance (CINA) petition, the blindness of a child's parent, guardian, or custodian is relevant only to the extent that the court finds, based on clear and convincing evidence in the record, that the blindness affects the ability of the parent, guardian, or custodian to give proper care and attention to the child and the child's needs; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/10/2016 3/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-338, 5-350, 5-3A-35, 5-3B-19, 5-525, 9-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM