Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Education Credit
Sponsored by
Senators DeGrange, Currie, Eckardt, Edwards, Jennings, Klausmeier, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Peters, Reilly, and Serafini
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a tax credit against the State income tax for contributions made to specified student assistance organizations; requiring the Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce to administer the tax credit; requiring specified entities to submit an application to be a student assistance organization on or before December 1 each year; establishing the Maryland Education Tax Credit Reserve Fund; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1343
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {453921/2 Rejected (17-27)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Feldman) {523425/1 Rejected (19-26)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {543321/1 Rejected (19-26)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {303529/1 Rejected (17-29)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {143621/1 Rejected (11-30)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {273621/1 Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {533822/1 Rejected (16-30)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (25-19)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 43
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {453921/2 Rejected (17-27) 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Feldman) {523425/1 Rejected (19-26) 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {543321/1 Rejected (19-26) 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {303529/1 Rejected (17-29) 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Young) Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {143621/1 Rejected (11-30) 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {273621/1 Rejected (14-31) 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {533822/1 Rejected (16-30) 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (25-19) 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 46
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-205, 10-306, 10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM