Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption from County Tax Limitations
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "cost" to include specified operating expenses; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county to set special rates for any class of property in a special taxing district that is subject to the county property tax; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county to set a property tax rate in a special taxing district that is higher than the county tax limitation, notwithstanding specified provisions of law or a county charter; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-302, 6-302.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM