Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Hershey, and Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting from the certificate of need requirements for change of scope or capital expenditures the conversion of a licensed general hospital to a freestanding medical facility, in accordance with specified requirements; increasing from 45 to 90 the number of days before the proposed closing of a health care facility for the filing of the notice of the proposed closing; establishing the workgroup on rural health care delivery to study health care needs in five specified counties; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1350
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {907172/1
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {873325/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {706987/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Hornberger) {773529/1 Rejected (39-87)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted (117-11)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {907172/1 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {873325/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 56
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {706987/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Hornberger) {773529/1 Rejected (39-87) 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted (117-11) 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-120, 19-201, 19-211, 19-3A-01, 19-3A-03, 19-3A-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM