Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Benson, Currie, Jones-Rodwell, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Muse, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Rosapepe, and Stone
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Authorizing a secured party or any other party in interest to file a motion for a deficiency judgment under specified circumstances; requiring a specified motion for a deficiency judgment to be filed within a specified time period; requiring the specified party that files a specified motion for deficiency judgment to file within 3 years after the final ratification of the auditor's report; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0274
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {858675/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Brinkley) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {858675/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {280818/3 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (100-34)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {858675/1 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Laid Over (Senator Brinkley) Adopted 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments {858675/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49
House 3/21/2014 3/18/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable with Amendments {280818/3 Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (100-34) 66
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.13 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM