Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a unit from requiring a prime contractor and a prime contractor from requiring a subcontractor to begin change order work under a contract until the procurement officer for the unit issues a specified written change order; requiring, under specified circumstances, a unit to pay an invoice for the work performed and accepted under a change order within 30 days after the unit receives the invoice in accordance with a specified provision of law; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0119
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {674639/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable with Amendments {674639/1 Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM