Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Negative Option Feature - Restrictions
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, Forehand, Kelley, King, Manno, Montgomery, Ramirez, Raskin, and Robey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a merchant from using a negative option feature in connection with a sale of consumer goods or consumer services or a free trial offer for consumer goods or consumer services unless the merchant provides the consumer with a written disclosure of the terms and conditions of the negative option feature; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1212
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0726 Session: 2010 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1324 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM