Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Process - Parental Consent
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 727
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an individualized education program team to obtain written consent from the parent of a child with a disability if the team proposes specified actions regarding the individualized education program of the child; requiring an individualized education program team, under specified circumstances, to send a parent specified written notice within 5 business days after a specified team meeting that informs the parent of specified rights to consent or refuse to consent to specified actions; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974137/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 727
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Process - Parental Consent
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {974137/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Process - Parental Consent
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 727
Text - Chapter - Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Process - Parental Consent
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM