Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and Accessibility
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing obsolete language regarding chemical information lists submitted to the Department of the Environment; requiring specified employers that cease to operate as a business or to take specified actions related to hazardous chemicals to submit a chemical information list to the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation (DLLR); requiring the DLLR to keep the chemical information list for at least 40 years; requiring an employer or the DLLR to provide specified access to specified information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0189
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {177073/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523695/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {177073/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 51
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {523695/1 Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) 60
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Passed Enrolled 58
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-501 through 6-504 )
(   5-405, 5-406, 5-407, 5-408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM