Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Applications for Renewal of Licenses, Permits, Certifications, or Registrations - Available by Mail
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a health occupations board to send by first-class mail a renewal application at the request of a licensee, permit holder, certificate holder, or registrant if the health occupations board chooses to send renewal notices or renewed licenses, permits, certifications, or registrations exclusively by e-mail under certain provisions of law.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Applications for Renewal of Licenses, Permits, Certifications, or Registrations - Available by Mail
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Favorable Adopted 31
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Second Reading Passed 31
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Applications for Renewal of Licenses, Permits, Certifications, or Registrations - Available by Mail
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (40-0) 33
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 34
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Applications for Renewal of Licenses, Permits, Certifications, or Registrations - Available by Mail
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM