Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Service Contracts - Procurement, Audit, and Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Astle, Benson, Frosh, Klausmeier, Manno, Muse, Pugh, Ramirez, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a definition for the purpose of removing authorization that services provided by a State facility may be procured through a service contract; requiring that service contracts for State services be subject to an audit; requiring that audit findings be reported to the General Assembly and made available to the public; requiring that units of State government submit information to exclusive representatives and the public; and providing for the conduct of audits.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0815
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM