Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Imposing a tax on the production of natural gas from specified wells in the State; setting the rate of the tax at 2.5% of the gross fair market value of natural gas produced at the wellhead; providing for the administration of the tax by the Comptroller; providing for the distribution of revenue from the tax; establishing the Natural Gas Impact Account as a special, nonlapsing fund in the Oil and Gas Fund; requiring the Department of the Environment to administer the Account; specifying the contents of the Account; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0535 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-124.1 )
(   10.5-101 through 10.5-301, 1-101, 13-1001, 13-1003, 13-1008, 13-1102, 13-1104, 13-201, 13-508, 13-509, 13-825, 2-102, 2-104, 2-11A-01, 2-11A-02 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM