Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Democracy and Representative Government in Maryland for the 21st Century
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Raskin, Currie, Ferguson, Garagiola, Kittleman, Manno, and Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Democracy and Representative Government in Maryland for the 21st Century; providing for the membership and staff of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study, evaluate, and make recommendations for changes to the General Assembly's structure, organization, and process that would achieve specified goals; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1250 Session: 2004 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM