Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman and Raskin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a Maryland corporation or a real estate investment trust has the power to renounce specified business opportunities in its charter or declaration of trust or by a specified resolution; repealing specified provisions of law relating to dividends payable in shares of one class of a corporation's stock to holders of shares of another class of the corporation's stock; altering the circumstances under which a corporation registered as an open-end company may redeem shares of its stock from any stockholder; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0916
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed 42
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 46
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 59
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-103, 2-309, 2-310.1, 2-403, 2-404, 2-405, 2-408, 2-502, 2-507, 2-510.1, 3-104, 3-105, 3-106.1, 3-109, 3-202, 3-203, 3-511, 3-901, 8-102, 8-201, 8-301, 8-501.1, 8-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM