Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Roger Brooke Taney Statue - Removal and Storage
Sponsored by
Senators Muse and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commission on Artistic Property, on or before December 31, 2016, to remove the Roger Brooke Taney statue from the grounds of the State House and store the statue at the Maryland State Archives.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0532
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1016, 9-1021 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM