Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Products That Contain Mercury - Prohibition on Sale of Electric Switches, Electric Relays, and Gas Valve Switches
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Madaleno, Manno, Pinsky, and Smith
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 808
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a specified marketer from knowingly selling or providing electric switches, electric relays, and gas valve switches that contain mercury to a consumer on or after October 1, 2018; establishing specified penalties for specified violations; authorizing the Department of the Environment to impose specified penalties in a specified manner for specified violations.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0504
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {843025/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {960918/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-22)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 808
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Products That Contain Mercury - Prohibition on Sale of Electric Switches, Electric Relays, and Gas Valve Switches
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Floor Amendment {843025/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Products That Contain Mercury - Prohibition on Sale of Electric Switches, Electric Relays, and Gas Valve Switches
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {960918/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (116-22) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Products That Contain Mercury - Prohibition on Sale of Electric Switches, Electric Relays, and Gas Valve Switches
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 808
Text - Chapter - Products That Contain Mercury - Prohibition on Sale of Electric Switches, Electric Relays, and Gas Valve Switches
(   6-905, 6-905.3, 6-905.3 through 6-905.6 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page