Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program - Eligibility - Lead-Based Paint Affected Properties
Sponsored by
Senators Carter, Kagan, Lam, and Washington
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the information required to be provided to the Department of Commerce in order to qualify for certain tax credit enhancements under the Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program to include, with respect to certain qualified opportunity zone business property, a detailed plan for the performance of certain lead hazard reduction activities; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0566
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program - Eligibility - Lead-Based Paint Affected Properties
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Adopted 30
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program - Eligibility - Lead-Based Paint Affected Properties
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Ways and Means Environment and Transportation 33
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/25/2020 8:18 AM