Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Possession of Medical Cannabis in Local Correctional Facilities – Prohibition
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators and Anne Arundel County Senators
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a certain provision of law may not be construed to authorize the possession of marijuana or cannabis on the grounds of a local correctional facility; authorizing the imposition of certain penalties for the possession of marijuana or cannabis on the grounds of a local correctional facility; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1218
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {487872/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {487872/1
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {487872/1 (Finance Committee)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Committee Amendment {487872/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {983028/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-5)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Judiciary
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Washington County - Possession of Medical Cannabis in Correctional Facilities - Prohibition
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {487872/1 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {487872/1 41
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Serafini) Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {487872/1 (Finance Committee) 41
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Serafini) Adopted 41
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Committee Amendment {487872/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Floor Amendment {983028/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Possession of Medical Cannabis in Local Correctional Facilities – Prohibition
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (40-5) 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations Judiciary 44
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM