Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Garrett County - Multiple Event License
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the holder of a special multiple event Class C license in Garrett County to ensure that at least one individual who is certified by an approved alcohol awareness program is on the premises when alcoholic beverages are served; authorizing the license holder to store specified alcoholic beverages between specified events under specified circumstances and conditions; providing that a license holder who violates the Act is subject to specified fines and denial of specified licenses; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 53
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM