Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Madaleno, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, and Young
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Power Plant Research Program to conduct a study of regulatory reforms and market incentives that may be necessary or beneficial to increase the use of energy storage devices in the State; requiring the Program to consult with specified entities and interests in conducting the study; prohibiting the cost of the study from exceeding $125,000 per fiscal year; requiring the Program to make its final report and recommend policy actions to specified Committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0773
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {397673/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {397673/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM