Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Security Policy
Sponsored by
Senator Hough
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the statewide information technology master plan developed by the Secretary of Information Technology to include a specified policy requiring specified vendors to establish that an information technology product or piece of equipment is safe from embedded security threats.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1162 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page