Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government Agents - Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under certain circumstances, a government agent from requesting information about immigration or citizenship status of a person or a person's family members or acquaintances; prohibiting a government agent from coercing information or action from a person by using certain information; authorizing a person to use a certain legal remedy and recover court costs and reasonable attorney's fees under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1165
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Government Agents - Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM